VA SB252 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmacy benefit managers; licensure and regulation. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2021, no person is authorized to provide pharmacy benefit management services or otherwise act as a pharmacy benefit manager without first obtaining a license from the State Corporation Commission. Such licenses are to be renewed annually. The bill prohibits a pharmacy benefit manager from participating in spread pricing, defined in the bill, and provides that except for any agreed-upon administrative fee, all funds, including any rebates received by the pharmacy benefit manager in relation to providing pharmacy benefit management services for a carrier, will be distributed to the carrier.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefit managers; licensure and regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Commerce and Labor (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27SenateIncorporated by Commerce and Labor
2020-01-15SenateAssigned C&L sub: Health Insurance
2020-01-02SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101087D

Same As/Similar To

SB251 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1288)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823465(n/a)See Bill Text
3823467(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback