VA SB250 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Minority Business Enterprise; small, women-owned, and minority-owned businesses; enhancement or remedial measures. Authorizes the Department of Minority Business Enterprise to investigate complaints alleging that a business certified as a small, women-owned, or minority-owned business does not meet the minimum certification standards. Under the bill, if the Director determines that a business has violated the requirements of certification the business's certification as a small, women-owned, or minority-owned business shall be revoked for a period of one year. In addition, the bill provides for the Department to monitor any additional costs incurred on construction projects as a result of any remediation or enhancement measure established for such projects. The bill also makes technical amendments.
Title
Small, women-owned, and minority-owned businesses; enhancement or remedial measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-03-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-08 | House: Motion to refer to committee agreed to | |
2012-03-08 | House: Speaker ruled committee substitute 12105856D-H1 not germane | |
2012-03-08 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-07 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-07 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read second time | |
2012-03-01 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105856D-H1 | |
2012-03-01 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 1-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB250S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Obenshain agreed to 12105023D-S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 12105023D-S1 (Obenshain) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100287D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 965.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1403.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |