VA SB244 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dam Safety Act; low traffic roadways. Requires the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board to adopt regulations that consider the impact of downstream limited-use or private roadways with low traffic volume and low public safety risk on the determination of the hazard potential classification of an impounding structure.
Title
Dam Safety Act; Soil & Water Conservation Board to adopt regulations concerning low traffic roadway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041) | |
2010-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 41 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB244ER) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-19 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101242D |