VA SB216 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers; compensation for recall, warranty, and maintenance obligations. Provides that manufacturer or distributor compensated parts, service, diagnostic work, and updates to a vehicle accessory or function are subject to compensation related to recall and warranty. The bill excludes certain parts and services from consideration in calculating recall and warranty compensation and clarifies what is required of manufacturers and dealers in compensating motor vehicle dealers for recall and warranty parts and service.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers; compensation for recall, warranty, and maintenance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 715 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB216ER2) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB216ER) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB216S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105346D-S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105346D-S1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101873D |
Same As/Similar To
HB259 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
HB259 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
HB259 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)