VA SB214 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meetings conducted through electronic meetings. Amends existing provisions concerning electronic meetings by keeping the provisions for electronic meetings held in response to declared states of emergency, repealing the provisions that are specific to regional and state public bodies, and allowing public bodies to conduct all-virtual public meetings where all of the members who participate do so remotely and that the public may access through electronic communications means. Definitions, procedural requirements, and limitations for all-virtual public meetings are set forth in the bill, along with technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meetings conducted through electronic meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-Y) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-Y) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-Y) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (16-Y 24-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104118D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1322.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1627.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2455 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3707.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3708.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3708.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3714 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |