VA SB202 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nondiscrimination in public employment. Prohibits discrimination in public employment on the basis of sexual orientation or gender identity, as defined in the bill. The bill also codifies for state and local government employment the current prohibitions on discrimination in employment on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, age, marital status, disability, or status as a veteran.
Title
Public employment; prohibits discrimination on basis of sexual orientation or gender identity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18100785D-E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB202E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Ebbin agreed to |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100785D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |