VA SB198 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; operation of government stores. Allows certain holders of a distiller's license, appointed as agents of the ABC Board, to also sell alcoholic beverages produced on the licensed premises. Currently, the alcoholic beverages must be manufactured by the licensees. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; operation of government stores.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609) | |
2008-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 609 (effective 3/12/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB198ER) | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (80-Y 18-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed House (80-Y 18-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-28 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming | |
2008-01-30 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-30 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 081776304-E | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB198E | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/07 081776304 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB198 |