VA SB1757 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Custody and visitation arrangements; best interests of the child; child abuse. Requires the court to consider child abuse, in addition to family abuse and sexual abuse in current law, when determining the best interests of the child for the purposes of custody and visitation arrangements.
Title
Custody and visitation arrangements; best interests of the child, domestic abuse and child abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1757S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105819D-S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105819D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104232D |