VA SB169 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; Request for Proposal for architectural or engineering services. Provides that in the case of the selection process for a Request for Proposal for architectural or engineering services, the public body shall not request or require offerors to list any exceptions to proposed contractual terms and conditions, unless such terms and conditions are required by statute, regulation, ordinance, or applicable capital outlay standards, until after the qualified offerors are ranked.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; Request for Proposals for architectural or engineering services.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 175 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB169ER) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee amendment rejected |
2016-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB169S1 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104901D-S1 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104901D-S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102404D |
Same As/Similar To
HB578 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)