VA SB16 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Security freezes; fees. Reduces the maximum amount that a credit reporting agency may charge to place, remove, or lift a security freeze on a consumer's credit report from $10 to $5. This bill is identical to HB 1027 and incorporates SB 18, SB 22, SB 38, SB 62, and SB 659.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Security freezes; fees for placing on a consumer's credit report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
2018-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 303 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-05SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
2018-03-02SenateSigned by President
2018-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB16ER)
2018-02-27SenateEnrolled
2018-02-23HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23HouseRead third time
2018-02-22HouseRead second time
2018-02-20HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-15HouseRead first time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB16S1
2018-02-12SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106944D-S1
2018-02-12SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-12SenateRead second time
2018-02-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateIncorporates SB659 (Wagner)
2018-02-07SenateIncorporates SB62 (Favola)
2018-02-07SenateIncorporates SB38 (McPike)
2018-02-07SenateIncorporates SB22 (Surovell)
2018-02-07SenateIncorporates SB18 (Spruill)
2018-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106944D-S1
2018-02-07SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
2017-11-20SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100554D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591444.2(n/a)See Bill Text
591444.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB16
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB16+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB16S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB16ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0303+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S02V0117+SB0016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0398SB0016+SB0016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0405SB0016+SB0016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0406SB0016+SB0016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H14V0181+SB0016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0991+SB0016

Bill Comments

feedback