VA SB1533 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Possession of antique firearms; nonviolent felons. Permits nonviolent felons to possess, transport, and carry muzzle-loading firearms and black powder in a quantity not exceeding five pounds if it is intended to be used solely for sporting, recreational, or cultural purposes in muzzle-loading firearms.
Title
Antique firearms; possession by nonviolent felons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767) | |
2017-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 767 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1533ER) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Title replaced 17105395D-H1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House with substitute (94-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1533H1 |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105395D-H1 |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105395D-H1 |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103505D |