VA SB153 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Taxes for certain local improvements; Orange County. Adds Orange County to those localities with authority to impose taxes or assessments upon the abutting property owners for the initial improving and paving of an existing street provided not less than 50 percent of such abutting property owners who own not less than 50 percent of the property abutting such street request the improvement or paving. The law provides that the taxes or assessments permitted shall not be in excess of the peculiar benefits resulting from the improvements to such abutting property owners.
Title
Orange County; taxes for certain local improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 2-N) |
2015-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101842D |