VA SB15 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bonds; capital projects at colleges and universities. Authorizes the Treasury Board to issue bonds pursuant to Article X, Section 9 (c) of the Constitution of Virginia in an amount up to $206,870,000 plus financing costs to finance revenue-producing capital projects at institutions of higher education. The bill declares that an emergency exists and that the bill is effective upon passage.
Title
Higher Educational Institutions Bond Act of 2010; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194) | |
2010-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 194 (effective 4/7/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB15ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2009-12-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2009-12-18 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/10 10101381D |