VA SB149 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Smoking in outdoor amphitheater or concert venue; civil penalty. Authorizes any locality, by ordinance, to designate reasonable no-smoking areas within an outdoor amphitheater or concert venue owned by the locality. The bill requires such ordinance to (i) require adequate signage designating such areas, (ii) provide that a violation of such ordinance is subject to a civil penalty of not more than $25 to be paid into the treasury of the locality where the offense occurred and expended solely for public health purposes, and (iii) provide that any law-enforcement officer may issue a summons regarding a violation of the ordinance. The bill contains a reenactment clause.
Title
Outdoor amphitheater or concert venue; nonsmoking areas, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N) (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (27-Y 10-N) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 35-N) (Y: 4 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (27-Y 10-N) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 35-N) (Y: 4 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799) | |
2018-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 799 (effective - see bill) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB149ER) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2018-03-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (79-Y 17-N) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 18108268D-S1 |
2018-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Gilbert, Habeeb, Bourne |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Sturtevant, Edwards, Chase |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (27-Y 10-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | House requested conference committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 35-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House with substitute (56-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB149H1 |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107960D-H1 |
2018-03-07 | House | Substitute by Delegate Peace withdrawn 18108024D-H2 |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | House | Floor substitute printed 18108024D-H2 (Peace) |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107960D-H1 |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N) |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101569D |