VA SB1475 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1475
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Execution of search warrants; emergency. Provides that a search warrant for the search of any place of abode shall be executed by initial entry of the abode only in the daytime hours between 8:00 a.m. and 5:00 p.m. unless (i) a judge or a magistrate, if a judge is not available, authorizes the execution of such search warrant at another time for good cause shown by particularized facts in an affidavit or (ii) prior to the issuance of the search warrant, law-enforcement officers lawfully entered and secured the place to be searched and remained at such place continuously. The bill also provides that a law-enforcement officer shall make reasonable efforts to locate a judge before seeking authorization to execute the warrant at another time, unless circumstances require the issuance of the warrant after 5 p.m., in which case the law-enforcement officer may seek such authorization from a magistrate without first making reasonable efforts to locate a judge. The bill contains an emergency clause. Execution of search warrants; emergency. Provides that a search warrant for the search of any place of abode shall be executed by initial entry of the abode only in the daytime hours between 8:00 a.m. and 5:00 p.m. unless (i) a judge or a magistrate, if a judge is not available, authorizes the execution of such search warrant at another time for good cause shown by particularized facts in an affidavit or (ii) prior to the issuance of the search warrant, law-enforcement officers lawfully entered and secured the place to be searched and remained at such place continuously. The bill also provides that a law-enforcement officer shall make reasonable efforts to locate a judge before seeking authorization to execute the warrant at another time, unless circumstances require the issuance of the warrant after 5 p.m., in which case the law-enforcement officer may seek such authorization from a magistrate without first making reasonable efforts to locate a judge. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Search warrants; date and time of issuance, exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 34 (effective 3/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1475ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1475S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104245D-S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104245D-S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21103588D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1475 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote