VA SB1475 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1475
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Execution of search warrants. Provides that a search warrant for the search of any place of abode shall be executed by initial entry of the abode only in the daytime hours between 8:00 a.m. and 5:00 p.m. unless (i) a judge or a magistrate, if a judge is not available, authorizes the execution of such search warrant at another time for good cause shown by particularized facts in an affidavit; or (ii) prior to the issuance of the search warrant, law-enforcement officers lawfully entered and secured the place to be searched and remained at such place continuously. The bill also provides that a law-enforcement officer shall make reasonable efforts to locate a judge before seeking authorization to execute the warrant at another time, unless the warrant was issued after 5 p.m., in which case the law-enforcement officer may seek such authorization from a magistrate without first making reasonable efforts to locate a judge. Execution of search warrants. Provides that a search warrant for the search of any place of abode shall be executed by initial entry of the abode only in the daytime hours between 8:00 a.m. and 5:00 p.m. unless (i) a judge or a magistrate, if a judge is not available, authorizes the execution of such search warrant at another time for good cause shown by particularized facts in an affidavit; or (ii) prior to the issuance of the search warrant, law-enforcement officers lawfully entered and secured the place to be searched and remained at such place continuously. The bill also provides that a law-enforcement officer shall make reasonable efforts to locate a judge before seeking authorization to execute the warrant at another time, unless the warrant was issued after 5 p.m., in which case the law-enforcement officer may seek such authorization from a magistrate without first making reasonable efforts to locate a judge.
Title
Search warrants; date and time of issuance, exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1475S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104245D-S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104245D-S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21103588D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1475 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote