VA SB1457 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1457
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Preservation of historic sites. Provides that any locality utilizing the urban county executive form of government (Fairfax County) may include a provision in its historic preservation ordinance that would allow public access to an historic area, landmark, building, or structure, or land pertaining thereto, or providing that no subdivision shall occur within any historic district unless approved by the review board or, on appeal, by the governing body of the locality as being compatible with the historic nature of such area, landmarks, buildings, or structures therein with regard to any parcel or parcels that collectively are (i) adjacent to a navigable river and a national park and (ii) in part or as a whole subject to an easement granted to the National Park Service or Virginia Outdoors Foundation granted on or after January 1, 1973. Preservation of historic sites. Provides that any locality utilizing the urban county executive form of government (Fairfax County) may include a provision in its historic preservation ordinance that would allow public access to an historic area, landmark, building, or structure, or land pertaining thereto, or providing that no subdivision shall occur within any historic district unless approved by the review board or, on appeal, by the governing body of the locality as being compatible with the historic nature of such area, landmarks, buildings, or structures therein with regard to any parcel or parcels that collectively are (i) adjacent to a navigable river and a national park and (ii) in part or as a whole subject to an easement granted to the National Park Service or Virginia Outdoors Foundation granted on or after January 1, 1973.
Title
Historic sites; urban county executive form of gov't. (Fairfax County), provisions in its ordinance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531) | |
2021-04-07 | House | Enacted, Chapter 531 (effective 4/7/21) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1457ER2) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2021-04-07 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2021-04-07 | House | VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 5-N) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1457ER) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102678D-E |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1457E |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21102678D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1457 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Emergency Legislation
Fairfax County
Historic Areas Landmarks and Monuments
Ordinances
Emergency Legislation
Fairfax County
Historic Areas Landmarks and Monuments
Ordinances