VA SB1447 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1447
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fees for management and disposal of solid waste; Buckingham County. Adds Buckingham County to the list of counties authorized, by ordinance and after a public hearing, to levy a fee for the management of solid waste not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in removing and disposing of solid waste and to the list of counties authorized, by ordinance and after a public hearing, to levy a fee for the disposal of solid waste not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in procuring, developing, maintaining, and improving the landfill and for such reserves as may be necessary for capping and closing such landfill in the future. Fees for management and disposal of solid waste; Buckingham County. Adds Buckingham County to the list of counties authorized, by ordinance and after a public hearing, to levy a fee for the management of solid waste not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in removing and disposing of solid waste and to the list of counties authorized, by ordinance and after a public hearing, to levy a fee for the disposal of solid waste not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in procuring, developing, maintaining, and improving the landfill and for such reserves as may be necessary for capping and closing such landfill in the future.
Title
Buckingham County; fees for disposal of solid waste.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 63 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1447ER) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103324D-E |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1447E |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Peake agreed to |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21103324D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1447 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote