VA SB1447 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fees for management and disposal of solid waste; Buckingham County. Adds Buckingham County to the list of counties authorized, by ordinance, and after a public hearing, to levy a fee for the management of solid waste not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in removing and disposing of solid waste, and the list of counties authorized by ordinance, and after a public hearing, to levy a fee for the disposal of solid waste not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in procuring, developing, maintaining, and improving the landfill and for such reserves as may be necessary for capping and closing such landfill in the future. Fees for management and disposal of solid waste; Buckingham County. Adds Buckingham County to the list of counties authorized, by ordinance, and after a public hearing, to levy a fee for the management of solid waste not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in removing and disposing of solid waste, and the list of counties authorized by ordinance, and after a public hearing, to levy a fee for the disposal of solid waste not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in procuring, developing, maintaining, and improving the landfill and for such reserves as may be necessary for capping and closing such landfill in the future.
Title
Buckingham County; fees for disposal of solid waste.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103324D-E |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1447E |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Peake agreed to |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21103324D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1447 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote