VA SB1443 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive plan; sea-level rise. Provides that any locality included in the Hampton Roads Planning District Commission shall incorporate into the next scheduled and all subsequent reviews of its comprehensive plan strategies to combat projected relative sea-level rise and recurrent flooding. The bill requires such review to be coordinated with the other localities in the Hampton Roads Planning District Commission. The bill requires the Department of Conservation and Recreation, the Department of Emergency Management, the Marine Resources Commission, Old Dominion University, and the Virginia Institute of Marine Science to provide technical assistance to any such locality upon request.
Title
Comprehensive plan; strategies to combat projected sea-level rise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 11-N) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 11-N) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1443ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Title replaced 15105086D-H1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (27-Y 11-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 11-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute (90-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1443H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105086D-H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105086D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1443S1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104670D-S1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104670D-S1 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (7-Y 6-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15102981D |