VA SB1427 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1427
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board established. Establishes the Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board for the purpose of assisting the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services in expanding the provision of high-quality, evidence-based early psychosis and mood disorder detection and intervention services. Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board established. Establishes the Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board for the purpose of assisting the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services in expanding the provision of high-quality, evidence-based early psychosis and mood disorder detection and intervention services.
Title
Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1427S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103085D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103085D-S1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21100852D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1427 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote