VA SB1427 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1427
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board established. Establishes the Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board for the purpose of assisting the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services in expanding the provision of high-quality, evidence-based early psychosis and mood disorder detection and intervention services. Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board established. Establishes the Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board for the purpose of assisting the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services in expanding the provision of high-quality, evidence-based early psychosis and mood disorder detection and intervention services.
Title
Early Psychosis Intervention and Coordinated Specialty Care Program Advisory Board; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200196D-H1 |
2021-02-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1427S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103085D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103085D-S1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21100852D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1427 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports