VA SB1426 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child pornography. Provides that a defendant convicted of an offense relating to child pornography shall be ordered to pay mandatory restitution to the victim of the offense in an amount as determined by the court. The Commonwealth shall make reasonable efforts to notify victims of any such offense.
Title
Child pornography; restitution for victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1426ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-26 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 11105670D-S2 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Deeds, Edwards, Quayle | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Janis, Loupassi, Watts | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1426H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105255D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105255D-H1 | |
2011-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1426S1 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104673D-S1 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104673D-S1 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11102967D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1995 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 275.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 42.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |