VA HB1995 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child pornography. Provides that a defendant convicted of an offense relating to child pornography shall be ordered to pay mandatory restitution to the victim of the offense in an amount as determined by the court. The Commonwealth shall make reasonable efforts to notify victims of any such offense.
Title
Child pornography; restitution for victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N) (Y: 5 N: 94 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N) (Y: 5 N: 94 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 575 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1995ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-26 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Conference substitute printed 11105678D-H2 | |
2011-02-23 | House: Delegates: Janis, Loupassi, Watts | |
2011-02-23 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Senators: Deeds, Edwards, Quayle | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-21 | House: House acceded to request | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Senate amendments rejected by House (1-Y 94-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Reconsideration of Senate amendments agreed to by House | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Senate amendments rejected by House (5-Y 92-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1995H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104749D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104749D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103198D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1426 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 374.1:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |