VA SB1417 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1417
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animal testing facilities; adoption of dogs and cats; civil penalty. Requires any animal testing facility, defined in the bill, that no longer has need for a dog or cat in its possession that does not pose a health or safety risk to the public or itself to offer, for a reasonable period of time prior to euthanasia, such dog or cat for adoption to a releasing agency or through a private placement or in the case of a testing facility operated by an agency or institution of higher education, develop its own adoption program. The bill authorizes an animal testing facility to enter into an agreement with a releasing agency for the implementation of the adoption. Violation is subject to a civil penalty of not more than $5,000 and any court costs and attorney fees. Animal testing facilities; adoption of dogs and cats; civil penalty. Requires any animal testing facility, defined in the bill, that no longer has need for a dog or cat in its possession that does not pose a health or safety risk to the public or itself to offer, for a reasonable period of time prior to euthanasia, such dog or cat for adoption to a releasing agency or through a private placement or in the case of a testing facility operated by an agency or institution of higher education, develop its own adoption program. The bill authorizes an animal testing facility to enter into an agreement with a releasing agency for the implementation of the adoption. Violation is subject to a civil penalty of not more than $5,000 and any court costs and attorney fees.
Title
Animal testing facilities; definitions, adoption of dogs and cats, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 340 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1417ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1417S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103722D-S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103722D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Assigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100835D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1417 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote