VA SB140 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire insurance; coverage for costs of services by volunteer fire departments. Requires fire insurance policies to provide coverage, with limits not less than $250, for the cost charged by a volunteer fire department that is not fully funded by property taxes in certain instances when the fire department is called in to save or protect property insured under the policy. Higher coverage limits may be offered for an additional premium. The amount billed shall not exceed the limit of coverage.
Title
Fire policy; shall provide coverage for cost charged by volunteer fire department, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB140ER) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Title replaced 12105427D-H1 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB140H1 | |
2012-02-24 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105427D-H1 | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105427D-H1 | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB140S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104382D-S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104382D-S1 | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Rereferred to Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101245D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1202 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0371)