VA SB139 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - House: Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - House: Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
County precincts; separate precinct for certain towns. Requires a county to establish a separate county precinct for any town entirely surrounded by a combination of a United States armed forces base and water.
Title
County precincts; separate precinct for certain towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | House: Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote | |
2012-02-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103989D |