VA SB1386 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State lottery; instant ticket game to benefit veterans. Creates an instant ticket lottery game to benefit veterans, to be available beginning January 1, 2012. Proceeds from the sale of the tickets shall be used by the Department of Veterans Services to benefit veterans of the armed forces who reside in the Commonwealth.
Title
Lottery Proceeds Fund; appropriates a portion to Department of Veterans Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Blevins [R] | Sen. Charles Colgan [D] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] |
Sen. Linda Puller [D] | Sen. Frederick Quayle [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11104976D-ES1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1386ES1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Colgan agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104976D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104976D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 2-N 1-A) | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11103073D |