VA SB1372 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plate; women veterans. Authorizes the issuance of special license plates for supporters of women veterans bearing the legend SUPPORT WOMEN VETERANS.
Title
License plates, special; issuance for women veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 241 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1372ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Title replaced 23106755D-H1 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1372H1 |
2023-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106755D-H1 |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106755D-H1 |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23101357D-E |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1372E |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Amendments by Senator McClellan agreed to |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101357D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2080 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
HB2080 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
HB2080 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)