VA HB2080 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plate; women veterans. Authorizes the issuance of special license plates for supporters of women veterans bearing the legend SUPPORT WOMEN VETERANS.
Title
License plates, special; issuance for women veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 240 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2080ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2080H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105095D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105095D-H1 |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101356D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1372 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
SB1372 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
SB1372 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)