VA SB1365 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1365
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Data governance; Office of Data Governance and Analytics; Chief Data Officer; Virginia Data Commission; report. Creates the Office of Data Governance (the Office) in the Office of the Secretary of Administration, to be directed by the existing Chief Data Officer of the Commonwealth. The Office is charged with overseeing general data governance in the Commonwealth, as well as developing and managing the Commonwealth Data Trust, a multi-stakeholder data exchange and analytics platform. A multi-level governance structure is established to govern the Trust. The bill also establishes the advisory Virginia Data Commission to advise the Office on issues relating to data sharing. Data governance; Office of Data Governance and Analytics; Chief Data Officer; Virginia Data Commission; report. Creates the Office of Data Governance (the Office) in the Office of the Secretary of Administration, to be directed by the existing Chief Data Officer of the Commonwealth. The Office is charged with overseeing general data governance in the Commonwealth, as well as developing and managing the Commonwealth Data Trust, a multi-stakeholder data exchange and analytics platform. A multi-level governance structure is established to govern the Trust. The bill also establishes the advisory Virginia Data Commission to advise the Office on issues relating to data sharing.
Title
Data Governance and Analytics, Office of; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1365S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104189D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104189D-S1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101944D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1365 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 203.2:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2558 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2564 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |