VA SB1359 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; school buildings; potable water; lead testing. Requires each local school board to develop and implement a plan to test for lead and, if necessary, remediate potable water from sources identified by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency as high priority for testing, giving priority in such testing plan to schools whose school building was constructed, in whole or in part, before 1986.
Title
School boards, local; lead testing of potable water in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1359ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Passed House with amendment (99-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-23 | House | Amendment by Delegate Landis agreed to |
2017-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1359S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104365D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104365D-S1 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100665D |