VA SB1343 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Commercial driver's licenses; specialized training required. Requires the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to include training on the recognition, prevention, and reporting of human trafficking in driver training for Class A, Class B, and Class C commercial motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial driver's licenses; specialized training required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 352 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1343ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1343S1
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105672D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105672D-S1
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103425D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462341.9:01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1343
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1343+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1343S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1343ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0352+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0049+SB1343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1343+SB1343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1343+SB1343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1902V0023+SB1343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0101+SB1343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2712+SB1343

Bill Comments

feedback