VA SB133 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Deferred disposition in criminal cases. Allows a court to defer and dismiss a criminal case where the defendant has been diagnosed with autism or an intellectual disability and the court finds by clear and convincing evidence that the criminal conduct was caused by or had a direct and substantial relationship to the person's disorder or disability.
Title
Criminal cases; deferred disposition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 7-N) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 7-N) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1004) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1004 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB133ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title replaced 20109032D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 7-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House with substitute (89-Y 7-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB133H1 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20109032D-H1 |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20109032D-H1 |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reconsidered by sub: Criminal |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101156D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.48:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 336 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |