VA SB1329 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1329
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Promises to appear after the issuance of a summons. Provides that if any person refuses to give a written promise to appear, the arresting officer shall give such person notice of the time and place of the hearing, note such person's refusal to give his written promise to appear on the summons, and forthwith release him from custody. Under current law, any person refusing to give such written promise to appear is required to be taken immediately by the arresting officer before a magistrate or other issuing officer having jurisdiction. Promises to appear after the issuance of a summons. Provides that if any person refuses to give a written promise to appear, the arresting officer shall give such person notice of the time and place of the hearing, note such person's refusal to give his written promise to appear on the summons, and forthwith release him from custody. Under current law, any person refusing to give such written promise to appear is required to be taken immediately by the arresting officer before a magistrate or other issuing officer having jurisdiction.
Title
Summons; promises to appear after issuance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 338 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1329ER) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House with amendments (86-Y 13-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101329D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1329 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote