VA SB1325 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1325
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Visitation; petition of grandparent. Allows a grandparent who has petitioned the court for visitation of a minor grandchild, in cases where the parent of the minor grandchild is deceased or incapacitated, to introduce evidence of such deceased or incapacitated parent's consent to visitation with the grandparent. The bill provides that if the parent's consent is proven by a preponderance of the evidence, the court may then determine if grandparent visitation is in the best interest of the minor grandchild. Visitation; petition of grandparent. Allows a grandparent who has petitioned the court for visitation of a minor grandchild, in cases where the parent of the minor grandchild is deceased or incapacitated, to introduce evidence of such deceased or incapacitated parent's consent to visitation with the grandparent. The bill provides that if the parent's consent is proven by a preponderance of the evidence, the court may then determine if grandparent visitation is in the best interest of the minor grandchild.
Title
Visitation; petition of grandparent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 253 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1325ER) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Title replaced 21200181D-H1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House with substitute (98-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1325H1 |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21200181D-H1 |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200181D-H1 |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1325S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103796D-S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103796D-S1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102917D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1325 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote