VA SB1325 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Visitation; petition of grandparent. Allows a grandparent who has petitioned the court for visitation of a minor grandchild, in cases where the parent of the minor grandchild is deceased or incapacitated, to introduce evidence of such deceased or incapacitated parent's consent to visitation with the grandparent. The bill provides that if the parent's consent is proven by a preponderance of the evidence, the court may determine the issue of grandparent visitation in the best interest of the minor grandchild. Visitation; petition of grandparent. Allows a grandparent who has petitioned the court for visitation of a minor grandchild, in cases where the parent of the minor grandchild is deceased or incapacitated, to introduce evidence of such deceased or incapacitated parent's consent to visitation with the grandparent. The bill provides that if the parent's consent is proven by a preponderance of the evidence, the court may determine the issue of grandparent visitation in the best interest of the minor grandchild.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Visitation; petition of grandparent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
2021-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1325S1
2021-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103796D-S1
2021-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-01SenateRead second time
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103796D-S1
2021-01-27SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 2-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102917D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback