VA SB1324 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Communicated to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Communicated to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Opportunity Educational Institution and Board established. Creates the Opportunity Educational Institution to be administered and supervised by the Opportunity Educational Institution Board. The bill requires any school that has been denied accreditation and permits any school that has been accredited with warning for three consecutive years to be transferred to the Institution and remain in the Institution for five years or until the school achieves full accreditation. The bill also sets forth requirements for student attendance, staffing, and funding for the Institution. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Opportunity Educational Institution; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (14-Y 25-N) (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (14-Y 25-N) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 13105680D-S2 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1324ER) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed House (64-Y 34-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 5-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Chair votes Yes |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13104509D-ES1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1324ES1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104509D-S1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (8-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104509D-S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13104215D |