VA SB1314 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment established; workforce and higher education alignment. Directs the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to establish an Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment (the Office) to coordinate data analysis on workforce and higher education alignment and translate data to partners. The Office shall provide a unified, consistent source of information or analysis for policy development and implementation related to talent development and shall partner with the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, institutions of higher education, the Virginia Employment Commission, GO Virginia, and other relevant entities to offer resources and expertise related to education and labor market alignment.
Title
Education and Labor Market Alignment, Office of; established.
Sponsors
Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102726D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1314 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote