VA SB1314 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1314

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment established; workforce and higher education alignment. Directs the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to establish an Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment (the Office) to coordinate data analysis on workforce and higher education alignment and translate data to partners. The Office shall provide a unified, consistent source of information or analysis for policy development and implementation related to talent development and shall partner with the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, institutions of higher education, the Virginia Department of Education, the Virginia Employment Commission, GO Virginia, and other relevant entities to offer resources and expertise related to education and labor market alignment. Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment established; workforce and higher education alignment. Directs the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to establish an Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment (the Office) to coordinate data analysis on workforce and higher education alignment and translate data to partners. The Office shall provide a unified, consistent source of information or analysis for policy development and implementation related to talent development and shall partner with the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, institutions of higher education, the Virginia Department of Education, the Virginia Employment Commission, GO Virginia, and other relevant entities to offer resources and expertise related to education and labor market alignment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education and Labor Market Alignment, Office of; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 502 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1314ER)
2021-02-25SenateEnrolled
2021-02-23SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Passage (83-Y 17-N)
2021-02-19HousePassed House with amendment (83-Y 17-N)
2021-02-19HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2021-02-19HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-19HouseRead third time
2021-02-18HouseRead second time
2021-02-16HouseReported from General Laws with amendment(s) (17-Y 4-N)
2021-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N)
2021-01-29SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N)
2021-01-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102726D

Same As/Similar To

SB1314 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222238(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1314
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1314+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1314ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0502+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200139A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1314AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1314AHE
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1314F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1314FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0019+SB1314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0071+SB1314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0161SB1314+SB1314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0209SB1314+SB1314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1101V0002+SB1314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0022+SB1314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1771+SB1314
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0334SB1314+SB1314

Bill Comments 750

feedback