VA SB1313 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local income tax. Adds the City of Portsmouth to the list of localities authorized to impose a local income tax to generate revenue to be used for transportation purposes. The bill also removes the requirement that the local income tax be approved by a referendum and repeals the five-year sunset on the local income tax.
Title
Income tax, local; City of Portsmouth authorized to levy to generate revenue for transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in Finance |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #2 |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (8-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103316D |