VA SB1305 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Inability to pay fees or costs on account of poverty; guidelines. Requires the court to use the guidelines for determining indigency for the appointment of counsel in determining a person's inability to pay fees or costs on account of poverty in a civil action. This bill is identical to HB 2328.
Title
Persons allowed services without fees or costs; inability to pay on account of poverty, guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 226 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1305ER) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17103129D-E |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1305E |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103129D |