VA SB1301 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1301
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Correctional facilities; use of isolated confinement. Prohibits the use of isolated confinement in state correctional facilities and juvenile correctional centers, subject to certain exceptions. Isolated confinement is defined in the bill as confinement of a prisoner or juvenile to a cell, alone or with another prisoner or juvenile, for 20 hours or more per day for an adult or for 17 hours or more per day for a juvenile, other than for the purpose of providing medical or mental health treatment. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act. Correctional facilities; use of isolated confinement. Prohibits the use of isolated confinement in state correctional facilities and juvenile correctional centers, subject to certain exceptions. Isolated confinement is defined in the bill as confinement of a prisoner or juvenile to a cell, alone or with another prisoner or juvenile, for 20 hours or more per day for an adult or for 17 hours or more per day for a juvenile, other than for the purpose of providing medical or mental health treatment. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Correctional facilities; use of isolated confinement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103986D-ES1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1301ES1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103986D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103986D-S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102557D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1301 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote