VA SB130 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Building Revitalization Grant Fund. Establishes the Building Revitalization Grant Fund administered by the Department of Housing and Community Development to award grants of up to $100,000 to businesses that make a capital investment of $1 million in revitalizing or retrofitting buildings to serve as a new place of business.
Title
Building Revitalization Grant Fund; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day in General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day in General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-23 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-23 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB130S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104765D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee amendments rejected | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104765D-S1 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100718D |