VA SB1279 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1279

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Veterans Services; initiatives to reduce unemployment among veterans; comprehensive transition program. Requires the Department of Veterans Services to develop a comprehensive program to assist military service members, veterans, and their spouses in making a successful transition from military to civilian life in Virginia. The program promotes strategies and services for connecting transitioning service members, veterans, and spouses to local, regional, state, and federal employment resources in Virginia, including (i) skills and workforce assessments and (ii) internship and apprenticeship programs. The bill also requires that the program prioritize assistance to military service members, veterans, and their spouses who have not sought services from or do not qualify for services under certain federal programs administered by the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Services, Department of; initiatives to reduce unemployment among veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1279ER)
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-19HouseRead third time
2021-02-18HouseRead second time
2021-02-16HouseReported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101920D

Same As/Similar To

SB1279 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222001.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1279
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1279+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1279ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0247+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1279F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1279FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0014+SB1279
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0067+SB1279
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0161SB1279+SB1279
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0193SB1279+SB1279
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0197SB1279+SB1279
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0198SB1279+SB1279
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1101V0003+SB1279
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0021+SB1279
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1753+SB1279

Bill Comments 750

feedback