VA SB1276 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1276
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0102)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0102)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Essential health benefits; abortion coverage. Removes the prohibition on the provision of coverage for abortions in any qualified health insurance plan that is sold or offered for sale through a health benefits exchange established or operating in Virginia.
Title
Essential health benefits; abortion coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] |
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0102) | |
2021-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 102 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1276ER) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-16 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House (54-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101217D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1276 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
HB1896 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
HB1896 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
HB1896 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
HB1896 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)