VA HB1896 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1896

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Essential health benefits; abortion coverage. Removes the prohibition on the provision of coverage for abortions in any qualified health insurance plan that is sold or offered for sale through a health benefits exchange established or operating in Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Essential health benefits; abortion coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
2021-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 101 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1896ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2021-02-18SenateRead third time
2021-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101445D

Same As/Similar To

HB1896 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
SB1276 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0102)
SB1276 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0102)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823451(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1896
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1896+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1896ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0101+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1896F171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1896FER171+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H14C0051+HB1896
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1138+HB1896
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02C0066+HB1896
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02V0005+HB1896
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0113HB1896+HB1896
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0154HB1896+HB1896

Bill Comments

feedback