VA SB1276 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Essential health benefits; abortion coverage. Removes the prohibition on the provision of coverage for abortions in any qualified health insurance plan that is sold or offered for sale through a health benefits exchange established or operating in Virginia.
Title
Essential health benefits; abortion coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] |
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101217D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1276 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote