VA SB127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Powers of Appointment Act. Codifies the Uniform Powers of Appointment Act (the Act), which governs the use of an estate planning tool that permits the owner of property to name a third party and give that person the power to direct the distribution of that property among some class of eligible recipients. The Act is based on the Restatement (Third) of Property: Wills and Other Donative Transfers and was adopted by the Uniform Law Commission in 2013.
Title
Uniform Powers of Appointment Act; codification of Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 266 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB127ER) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2015-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100155D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 2 | 2700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2741 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 423 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |