VA SB1269 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; tasting events held by distiller licensee or manufacturer of distilled spirits. Allows a licensed distiller who is an agent of the ABC Board to provide samples of beer, wine, or cider manufactured on the licensed premises or on contiguous premises of such agent licensed as a brewery or winery to persons under certain conditions. The bill also allows a manufacturer of distilled spirits, whether licensed in the Commonwealth or not, to obtain up to four banquet licenses per year for special events, which shall authorize the manufacturer to provide samples of spirits in designated areas at the special events to persons under certain conditions for the purposes of featuring and educating the consuming public about the manufacturer's spirits products.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; privileges of distiller's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 5-N) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 604 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1269ER) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House (85-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1269S2 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Deeds agreed to 15104170D-S2 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 15104149D-S1 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 15104170D-S2 (Deeds) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104149D-S1 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103389D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |